Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/25/2021 at 09:05:39 (UTC).

AGC Pacific Coast Plaza LLC vs BED BATH & BEYOND INC

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 AGC Pacific Coast Plaza LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BED BATH BEYOND INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M. Casserly. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Satisfied.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Satisfied

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy M. Casserly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGC Pacific Coast Plaza LLC

Defendant

Bed Bath & Beyond Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pauly, Andrew S

Defendant Attorney

Beehler, Anne Redcross

Attorney at BRYAN CAVE LEIGHTON PAISNER LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number (Participant Information)

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.

Order - Other (Order)

Order - Other (AND JUDGMENT ON OFFER OF JUDGMENT TO PLAINTIFF AGC PACIFIC COAST PLAZA LLC - GRANTED) filed by Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.

Notice - Other (Notices)

Notice - Other (OF OFFER OF JUDGMENT TO PLAINTIFF AGC PACIFIC COAST PLAZA LLC PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 998) filed by Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.

Satisfaction of Judgment - full

Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by AGC Pacific Coast Plaza LLC.

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by AGC Pacific Coast Plaza LLC.

Complaint

Complaint filed by AGC Pacific Coast Plaza LLC. Refers to: Bed Bath & Beyond Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by AGC Pacific Coast Plaza LLC. Refers to: Bed Bath & Beyond Inc

Summons

Original Summons filed by AGC Pacific Coast Plaza LLC. Refers to: Bed Bath & Beyond Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment - full filed by AGC Pacific Coast Plaza LLC. Filed By: AGC Pacific Coast Plaza LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/22/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for AGC Pacific Coast Plaza LLC and against Bed Bath & Beyond Inc for $ 15975.35, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 15975.35.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (AND JUDGMENT ON OFFER OF JUDGMENT TO PLAINTIFF AGC PACIFIC COAST PLAZA LLC - GRANTED) filed by Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. Filed By: Bed Bath & Beyond Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (OF OFFER OF JUDGMENT TO PLAINTIFF AGC PACIFIC COAST PLAZA LLC PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 998) filed by Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. Filed By: Bed Bath & Beyond Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. Filed By: Bed Bath & Beyond Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. Filed By: Bed Bath & Beyond Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by AGC Pacific Coast Plaza LLC. Filed By: AGC Pacific Coast Plaza LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by AGC Pacific Coast Plaza LLC. Refers to: Bed Bath & Beyond Inc Filed By: AGC Pacific Coast Plaza LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by AGC Pacific Coast Plaza LLC. Refers to: Bed Bath & Beyond Inc Filed By: AGC Pacific Coast Plaza LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by AGC Pacific Coast Plaza LLC. Refers to: Bed Bath & Beyond Inc Filed By: AGC Pacific Coast Plaza LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/22/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AGC Pacific Coast Plaza LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bed Bath and Beyond is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEEHLER ANNE REDCROSS