Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/14/2020 at 08:11:26 (UTC).

Aebi vs. Munshower

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 Aebi filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Munshower. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aebi, Robert Warren

Defendant

Munshower, David

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Aebi, Robert Warren. Refers to: Munshower, David

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Aebi, Robert Warren. Refers to: Munshower, David

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Aebi, Robert Warren. Refers to: Munshower, David

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (David Munshower) filed by Aebi, Robert Warren. Refers to: Munshower, David

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (David Munshower) filed by Aebi, Robert Warren. Refers to: Munshower, David

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Aebi, Robert Warren. Refers to: Munshower, David

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Aebi, Robert Warren.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (as to Unknown Occupants Only) filed by Aebi, Robert Warren. Refers to: Munshower, David

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (Including Unknown Occupants) filed by Aebi, Robert Warren. Refers to: Munshower, David

Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession issued.

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Aebi, Robert Warren.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Aebi, Robert Warren. Filed By: Aebi, Robert Warren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (Including Unknown Occupants) filed by Aebi, Robert Warren. Refers to: Munshower, David Filed By: Aebi, Robert Warren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketJudgment entered for Aebi, Robert Warren and against Munshower, David for a grand total of $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (David Munshower) filed by Aebi, Robert Warren. Refers to: Munshower, David Filed By: Aebi, Robert Warren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (David Munshower) filed by Aebi, Robert Warren. Refers to: Munshower, David Filed By: Aebi, Robert Warren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Munshower, David on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Aebi, Robert Warren .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Aebi, Robert Warren. Refers to: Munshower, David Filed By: Aebi, Robert Warren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Aebi, Robert Warren. Filed By: Aebi, Robert Warren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (as to Unknown Occupants Only) filed by Aebi, Robert Warren. Refers to: Munshower, David Filed By: Aebi, Robert Warren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Aebi, Robert Warren. Refers to: Munshower, David Filed By: Aebi, Robert Warren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Aebi, Robert Warren. Refers to: Munshower, David Filed By: Aebi, Robert Warren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Aebi, Robert Warren. Refers to: Munshower, David Filed By: Aebi, Robert Warren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less