This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/25/2021 at 03:14:21 (UTC).

Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC VS Forward Foods LLC

Case Summary

On 06/17/2020 Advantage Sales Marketing LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Forward Foods LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC

Defendant

Forward Foods LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ramsaur, Brett H

Attorney at RAMSAUR LAW OFFICE

Defendant Attorney

PIGGOTT, GEORGE B

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GEORGE B PIGGOTT APC

 

Court Documents

Stipulation for Entry of Judgment Against Defendant Forward Foods LLC

Stipulation for Entry of Judgment filed by Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC; Forward Foods LLC.

Judgment Against Defendant Forward Foods LLC

Judgment filed by Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC. Refers to: Forward Foods LLC

Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution submitted by Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC received but not filed on 12/07/2020.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 01/29/2021 at 09:30:00 AM in C-68 before Richard S. Whitney at Central.

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Forward Foods LLC.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service filed by Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC. Refers to: Forward Foods LLC

Complaint for Breach of Contract; and Common Count: Services Rendered [Quantum Merit]

[A document for ROA# 1]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC. Refers to: Forward Foods LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC. Refers to: Forward Foods LLC

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution submitted by Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC received but not filed on 12/07/2020. Filed By: Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC and against Forward Foods LLC for $ 126790.87, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 126790.87.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/29/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment filed by Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC. Refers to: Forward Foods LLC Filed By: Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Entry of Judgment filed by Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC; Forward Foods LLC. Filed By: Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC (Plaintiff); Forward Foods LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 01/29/2021 at 09:30:00 AM in C-68 before Richard S. Whitney at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/29/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Forward Foods LLC. Filed By: Forward Foods LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC. Filed By: Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC. Refers to: Forward Foods LLC Filed By: Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/07/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC. Refers to: Forward Foods LLC Filed By: Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 2]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC. Refers to: Forward Foods LLC Filed By: Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC. Refers to: Forward Foods LLC Filed By: Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PIGGOTT, GEORGE B