This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/28/2023 at 07:01:43 (UTC).

Abdallah vs Salgado

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Abdallah filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Salgado. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Abdallah, Olivia

Respondent

Salgado, Guillermo A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 01/13/2023 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCourt ordered the Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) dismissed without prejudice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned from N-03 to N-26 effective 12/31/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order reassigned to for 01/13/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in N-26 at North County.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 12/21/2022 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to party's motion to 01/13/2023 at 08:30AM in Department N-03.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Abdallah, Olivia. Refers to: Salgado, Guillermo; Filed By: Abdallah, Olivia (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition (UNSUCCESSFUL) filed by Abdallah, Olivia. Refers to: Salgado, Guillermo; Filed By: Abdallah, Olivia (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 12/21/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-03 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Abdallah, Olivia. Refers to: Salgado, Guillermo; Filed By: Abdallah, Olivia (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (GRANTED) filed by Abdallah, Olivia. Refers to: Salgado, Guillermo; Filed By: Abdallah, Olivia (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Other (court commissioner) filed by Salgado, Guillermo A.; Filed By: Abdallah, Olivia (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-03.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Abdallah, Olivia. Refers to: Salgado, Guillermo; Filed By: Abdallah, Olivia (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Abdallah, Olivia. Refers to: Salgado, Guillermo; Filed By: Abdallah, Olivia (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less