Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/20/2020 at 08:24:01 (UTC).

644 Kenwood LLC vs Peavey

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 644 Kenwood LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Peavey. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

644 Kenwood LLC

Defendant

Peavey, Latrese

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cox, Ben

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by 664 Kenwood LLC. Refers to: Peavey, Latrese

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by 664 Kenwood LLC. Refers to: Peavey, Latrese

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by 664 Kenwood LLC. Refers to: Peavey, Latrese

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by 644 Kenwood LLC. Refers to: Peavey, Latrese

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by 644 Kenwood LLC. Refers to: Peavey, Latrese

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by 644 Kenwood LLC.

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (and Unknowns) filed by 644 Kenwood LLC. Refers to: Peavey, Latrese

Writ of Possession issued

Writ of Possession issued.

Request for Entry of Default of Unnamed Tenants

Request for Entry of Default of Unnamed Tenants filed by 644 Kenwood LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (and Unknowns) filed by 644 Kenwood LLC. Refers to: Peavey, Latrese Filed By: 644 Kenwood LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketJudgment entered for 644 Kenwood LLC and against Peavey, Latrese for a grand total of $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by 644 Kenwood LLC. Filed By: 644 Kenwood LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default of Unnamed Tenants filed by 644 Kenwood LLC. Filed By: 644 Kenwood LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by 644 Kenwood LLC. Refers to: Peavey, Latrese Filed By: 644 Kenwood LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by 644 Kenwood LLC. Refers to: Peavey, Latrese Filed By: 644 Kenwood LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Peavey, Latrese on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by 644 Kenwood LLC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by 664 Kenwood LLC. Refers to: Peavey, Latrese Filed By: 644 Kenwood LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by 664 Kenwood LLC. Refers to: Peavey, Latrese Filed By: 644 Kenwood LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by 664 Kenwood LLC. Refers to: Peavey, Latrese Filed By: 644 Kenwood LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less