Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/10/2021 at 08:11:39 (UTC).

21st Century Insurance Company vs Ambrose

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 21st Century Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ambrose. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

21st Century Insurance Company

Defendant

Ambrose, Michael D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benson, Susan M

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by 21st Century Insurance Company. Refers to: Ambrose, Michael

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 (Case Initiation)

[A document for ROA# 1]

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

[A document for ROA# 2]

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by 21st Century Insurance Company. Refers to: Ambrose, Michael

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by 21st Century Insurance Company. Refers to: Ambrose, Michael Filed By: 21st Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 1]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by 21st Century Insurance Company. Refers to: Ambrose, Michael Filed By: 21st Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by 21st Century Insurance Company. Refers to: Ambrose, Michael Filed By: 21st Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 3]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by 21st Century Insurance Company. Refers to: Ambrose, Michael Filed By: 21st Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 21st Century Assurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENSON SUSAN M