This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/26/2021 at 08:06:50 (UTC).

20/20 Heating & Plumbing Inc vs McComas Construction Inc

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 20/20 Heating Plumbing Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against McComas Construction Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

20/20 Heating & Plumbing, Inc.

Defendants

Uptown Investments, LLC

McComas Construction, Inc.

Torrey Pines Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PICOZZI, EDWARD M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Complaint

Complaint filed by 20/20 Heating & Plumbing, Inc.. Refers to: McComas Construction, Inc.; Uptown Investments, LLC; Torrey Pines Bank

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by 20/20 Heating & Plumbing, Inc..

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by 20/20 Heating & Plumbing, Inc.. Refers to: McComas Construction, Inc.; Uptown Investments, LLC; Torrey Pines Bank

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by 20/20 Heating & Plumbing, Inc.. Refers to: McComas Construction, Inc.; Uptown Investments, LLC; Torrey Pines Bank Filed By: 20/20 Heating & Plumbing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by 20/20 Heating & Plumbing, Inc.. Filed By: 20/20 Heating & Plumbing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/22/2021 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by 20/20 Heating & Plumbing, Inc.. Refers to: McComas Construction, Inc.; Uptown Investments, LLC; Torrey Pines Bank Filed By: 20/20 Heating & Plumbing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTERN ALLIANCE BANK; DBA : TORREY PINE BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO TORREY PINES BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Uptown Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PICOZZI, EDWARD M