This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/24/2020 at 15:56:14 (UTC).

1037 4th Avenue LLC vs Wedge

Case Summary

On 08/29/2019 1037 4th Avenue LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Wedge. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1037 4th Avenue LLC

Defendant

Wedge, Jessica

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Relph, Christine

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC.

Order Setting Aside Default

Declaration - Other (TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND ORDER SIGNED 11/13/2019) filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC.

Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied

Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC.

Writ of Possession issued

Writ of Possession issued.

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (and All Unknown Occupants) filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC. Refers to: Wedge, Jessica

Request for Entry of Default of Unnamed Tenants

Request for Entry of Default of Unnamed Tenants filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC.

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC.

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC. Refers to: Wedge, Jessica

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC. Refers to: Wedge, Jessica

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC. Refers to: Wedge, Jessica

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC. Refers to: Wedge, Jessica

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC. Refers to: Wedge, Jessica

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC. Filed By: 1037 4th Avenue LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Wedge, Jessica .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to 1037 4th Avenue LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND ORDER SIGNED 11/13/2019) filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC. Filed By: 1037 4th Avenue LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC. Filed By: 1037 4th Avenue LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (and All Unknown Occupants) filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC. Refers to: Wedge, Jessica Filed By: 1037 4th Avenue LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketJudgment entered for 1037 4th Avenue LLC and against Wedge, Jessica for a grand total of $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC. Filed By: 1037 4th Avenue LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default of Unnamed Tenants filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC. Filed By: 1037 4th Avenue LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC. Refers to: Wedge, Jessica Filed By: 1037 4th Avenue LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC. Refers to: Wedge, Jessica Filed By: 1037 4th Avenue LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Wedge, Jessica on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC. Refers to: Wedge, Jessica Filed By: 1037 4th Avenue LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC. Refers to: Wedge, Jessica Filed By: 1037 4th Avenue LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by 1037 4th Avenue LLC. Refers to: Wedge, Jessica Filed By: 1037 4th Avenue LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1037 4th Avenue LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Relph, Christine