This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/16/2023 at 19:27:05 (UTC).

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA vs. Li, Shusen

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Li, Shusen. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Santa Clara Hall of Justice located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1430

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

Shusen Li

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Charles J. Smith

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • HearingDescription: Trial Setting; Department: Department 26; Time: 1:35PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingDescription: Trial Setting; Department: Department 26; Time: 1:35PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • HearingDescription: Trial Setting; Department: Department 26; Time: 1:35PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • HearingDescription: Trial Setting; Department: Department 26; Time: 1:35PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: Arraignment: Information; Department: Department 26; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Other; Department: Department 25; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: Preliminary Examination; Department: Department 25; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • HearingDescription: Preliminary Examination; Department: Department 35; Time: 8:31AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • HearingDescription: Arraignment: Complaint; Department: Department 84; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • HearingDescription: Arraignment: Complaint; Department: Department 84; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: Arraignment: Complaint; Department: Department 85; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less