This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 09:06:51 (UTC).

Zurich American Insurance Company V. The People Of The State Of Califo

Case Summary

On 01/31/2014 Zurich American Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The People Of The State Of Califo. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirwan, Peter and Kuhnle, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************9924

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirwan, Peter

Kuhnle, Thomas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zurich American Insurance Company

Zurich Insurance Company, U.S. Branch, By Operation Of Law

Defendants and Interested Parties

The County Of Santa Clara

The County Of Alameda

The County Of Los Angeles

The County Of Monterey

The County Of San Mateo

The County Of Solano

The County Of Ventura

The City Of Oakland

The City Of San Diego

The City And County Of San Francisco

Valerie Charlton

Nl Industries, Inc.

The People Of The State Of California

Charlton, Valerie

Intervenor

The Sherwin-Williams Company

Other

Superior Court of California County of Santa Clara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory, Mary E

Defendant Attorneys

Nancy L. Fineman

840 Malco1M Road, Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Fineman, Nancy L.

Serrano, Lawrence Javier

Van Kirk, Lorraine Alofa

Lam, Jenny Sue

Hansen, Greta Suzanne

Nishimura, Nanci Eiko

James H. McManis

50 W. San Fernando Street, 10Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95113

McManis, James H.

Fitzpatrick, Fidelma

Alexander, Mary

Berger, Justin Theodore

Interested Party Attorney

Antonen, Charles J.

Intervenor Attorney

Edwards, John W., II

Other Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Notice

Notice CMC reset from 2-23-18 to 8-17-18: Comment: CMC reset from 2/23/18 to 8/17/18

Notice

Notice CMC reset from 12-15-17 to 2-23-18: Comment: CMC reset from 12/15/17 to 2/23/18

Notice

Notice CMC reset from 9-22-17 to 12-15-17: Comment: CMC reset from 9/22/17 to 12/15/17

Notice

Notice CMC reset from 9-15-17 to 9-22-17: Comment: CMC reset from 9/15/17 to 9/22/17

Notice

Notice CMC reset from 4-14-17 to 9-15-17: Comment: CMC reset from 4/14/17 to 9/15/17

Notice

Notice CMC reset from 1-27-17 to 4-14-17: Comment: CMC reset from 1/27/17 to 4/14/17

Statement: Case Management Conference

Joint CMC Stmnt.pdf: Comment: Joint

Order

Order Case is Reassigned to Hon. Thomas E. Kuhnle: Comment: Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case to Hon. Thomas E. Kuhnle

Notice

Notice CMC reset from 11-4-16 to 1-27-17: Comment: CMC reset from 11/4/16 to 1/27/17

Minute Order

Minutes Non-Criminal:

Proof of Service

2018-10-17 POS for Joint CMC Statement.pdf: Comment: HRG 10/22/18 PROOF OF SERVICE

Statement: Case Management Conference

Joint CMC Statement: Comment: HRG 10/22/18 JOINT CASE STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Dismissal

Dismissal Without Prejudice of the Complaint as to Valerie Charlton only: Comment: Partial * Dismissal Without Prejudice of the Complaint as to Valerie Charlton only

Notice

Notice CMC 10-22-18 at 9am in D5: Comment: CMC set for 10/22/18 at 9am in D5

Minute Order

Minutes Non-Criminal:

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE.pdf: Comment: HRG 8/17/18 PROOF OF SERVICE

Statement: Case Management Conference

Joint CMC Statement & Exhs A-B.pdf: Comment: HRG 8/17/18 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Notice

Notice Start Time for CMC on 8-17-18 changed to 130pm: Comment: Start Time for CMC on 8/17/18 changed to 1:30pm

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice CMC on 7-29-19 is off calendar: Comment: CMC on 7/29/19 is off calendar.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Conference: Case Management - Joint CMC Statement: Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice CMC 7-29-19 at 130pm in D5: Comment: CMC set for 7/29/19 at 1:30pm in D5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice CMC 6-24-19 is vacated by the Court: Comment: CMC on 6/24/19 is vacated by the Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Joint CMC Statement: Comment: HRG 6-24-19 Joint Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Conference: Case Management - Joint CMC Statement HRG 5-13-19: Minutes Non-Criminal: Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: ... And Motion(s), if any

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice CMC 6-24-19 at 130pm in D5: Comment: CMC set for 6/24/19 at 1:30pm in D5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order - Minutes Non-Criminal:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - Proof of Service: Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2014
  • Document: Complex Lit - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complex Fee Payment Decision = M Closed = 02/11/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • Notice: Appearance - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = Atty Fineman EF- G60755 Legacy Name = CV Ntc of Appearance Decision = M Closed = 02/11/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Order: Deeming Case Complex - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = #G-60625 Order Deeming Case Complex & Staying Discovery - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan Legacy Name = CV Order Deeming Case Complex Decision = M Closed = 02/05/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • Errata - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Errata Decision = M Closed = 02/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • Notice: Related Cases - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = 1-00-CV-788657 Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Related Cases Decision = M Closed = 01/31/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • Complex Litigation: Provisional - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complex Lit/Provisional Decision = M Closed = 01/31/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 01/31/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • Document: Complex Lit - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complex Fee Payment Decision = M Closed = 01/31/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = Atty: Debra R. Puebla (213) 996-4200 Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 01/31/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 01/31/2014

    Read MoreRead Less