This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 08:03:42 (UTC).

Zosima Pequet et al vs DOES 1 through 20 et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 Zosima Pequet filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DOES 1 through 20. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3247

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Manansala, Remedios

Pequet, Zosima

Defendants

Valin, Rosa Belle

1 through 20, DOES

KINGSPARK VILLA

BELLE'S HAVEN

BLUEFIELD MANOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hough, Mary Patricia

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: HRG 11/27/18 Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: HRG 11/27/18 Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Clerk Rejection Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Application and Order: Ex Parte - Comment: *First Filing fee for Rosa Belle Valin is not paid, Ex-parte application was not sent up to the department.* To Extend Time For Service of Complaint by Stipulation and Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOUGH, MARY PATRICIA