This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:27:41 (UTC).

Zenith Insurance Company et al vs Rudolf Bock et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Zenith Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Rudolf Bock. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1811

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zenith Insurance Company

Solorzano, Alberto

Defendants

Bock, Oliver

Bock, Rudolf Oliver

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Williams, Jeffrey James

Layden, James David

Hibbard, Noel D.

Defendant Attorney

Dodson, Michael James

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Comment: *continued from 05/28/19*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: HRG 5/28/19 - Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion; Comment: *continued from 12/04/18*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Hrg 3/5/19 Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Notice - Comment: Of action; Atty Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less