This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/24/2022 at 22:15:42 (UTC).

Yvonne T. Thompson and Scott A. Thompson

Case Summary

On 12/06/2011 Yvonne T Thompson and Scott A Thompson was filed as a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1163

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Yvonne T. Thompson

Respondent

Scott A. Thompson

Minors

Adam Bradford Thompson

Race Theodore Thompson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: Yvonne Thompson,; Comment: re legal separation dismissal in its entirety

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 108; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: Yvonne Thompson,; Comment: Text = to vacate CMC Legacy Name = FL Stip and Order Decision = M Closed = 07/02/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 108; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Continued: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: Yvonne Thompson,; Comment: Text = to continue cmc Legacy Name = FL Stip and Order Decision = M Closed = 03/08/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service of Summons Filed; Filed By: Yvonne Thompson,; Comment: Text = re: Ptn, summs, blank resp... Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 03/08/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Case Status; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Case Management Conf Decision = M Closed = 03/08/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Case Status; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Case Management Conf Decision = M Closed = 03/08/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: Yvonne Thompson,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Stip and Order Decision = M Closed = 01/09/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2011
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2011
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Case Status; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Case Management Conf Decision = M Closed = 12/06/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2011
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Legal Separation w/minor; Filed By: Yvonne Thompson,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Legal Sep/Minor Decision = M Closed = 12/06/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2011
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Yvonne Thompson,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 12/06/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2011
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA; Filed By: Yvonne Thompson,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 12/06/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2011
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Residence; Filed By: Yvonne Thompson,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 12/06/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less