This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/03/2022 at 19:33:18 (UTC).

Ying Strong and James F. Strong

Case Summary

On 09/15/2014 Ying Strong and James F Strong was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3259

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ying Strong

Respondent

James Frederick Strong

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

X.. Young Lai

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2017
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Default; Department: Department 78; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Default; Department: Department 78; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation: Temporary Judge/Commissioner; Filed By: Ying Strong, James Strong,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketDescription: Declaration for default filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary); Filed By: Ying Strong,; Comment: and I&E Dec

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS; Filed By: Ying Strong,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336; Filed By: Ying Strong,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Property; Comment: (p) Separate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Property; Comment: (p) Community and Quasi-Community

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Supplemental; Filed By: Ying Strong,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: Ying Strong,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketDescription: Order: Publication or Posting; Filed By: Ying Strong,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Status; Department: Department 83; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Cancelled set for e-review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2014
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Cancelled Status Conference; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Cancelled Status Conference Decision = M Closed = 11/22/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Residence; Filed By: Ying Strong,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 09/15/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Ying Strong,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 09/15/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution no minor; Filed By: Ying Strong,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage/No minor Decision = M Closed = 09/15/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Property; Filed By: Ying Strong,; Comment: Text = Separate Legacy Name = FL Property Declaration Decision = M Closed = 09/15/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer X. Young Lai