This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/26/2019 at 11:05:27 (UTC).

YEAH1 NETWORK VIETNAM CO., LTD. vs DEFY MEDIA (ABC), LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 YEAH1 NETWORK VIETNAM CO , LTD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DEFY MEDIA ABC , LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Mikkelsen, Laurie and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6152

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

YEAH1 NETWORK VIETNAM CO., LTD., a Vietnam limited company

YEAH1 NETWORK VIETNAM CO., LTD.

Defendants

DEFY MEDIA (ABC), LLC, a California limited liability company

DEFY MEDIA (ABC), LLC

ARMANINO, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nguyen, Uyen N

Defendant Attorney

Miller, Elissa Diane

 

Court Documents

Statement: Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement: Comment: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • DispositionJudgment - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: YEAH1 NETWORK VIETNAM CO., LTD.; DEFY MEDIA (ABC), LLC; ARMANINO, LLP; Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Nguyen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketConference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketHearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketRequest: Dismissal - Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Nguyen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketNotice: Settlement - Comment: Notice: Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: TO COMPLAINT : ATTY MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketClerk Rejection Letter - Comment: EN 3161309 - First paper fees of $435 per defendant (a $870 total) must be attached to file paperwork on their behalf.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Case Management Statement: Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint on ARMANINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint on DEFY MEDIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint Filed - No Fee - Comment: FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Defy Media, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ARMANINO LLP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP; is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER ELISSA D. ESQ.