This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 15:46:16 (UTC).

Yang Jing vs GENERAL MOTORS, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2022 Yang Jing filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC , a Delaware Limited Liability Company. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8211

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yang Jing

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company

DGDG 4 LLC, a California Limited Liability Company dba Capitol Chevrolet

DGDG 4 LLC, a California Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Martin Zolonz

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/6/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

12/6/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

12/6/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Personal

1/5/2023 Proof of Service: Personal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Personal; Filed By: Yang Jing,; Comment: POS: Summons, Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Yang Jing,; Comment: Complaint (Case Initiation)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Yang Jing,; Comment: Summons (Summons)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Yang Jing,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Comment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less