This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 11:08:00 (UTC).

Yancey Silvas vs Tony Travis

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 Yancey Silvas filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Tony Travis. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8470

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yancey Silvas

Defendant

Tony Travis

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

4/2/2019 Minute Order

Minute Order

3/13/2019 Minute Order

Order

3/13/2019 Order

Minute Order

1/9/2019 Minute Order

Request to Continue/Reissue TRO HR

1/9/2019 Request to Continue/Reissue TRO HR

Proof of Service: Personal

1/7/2019 Proof of Service: Personal

Response: Petition Civil Harassment/Workplace Violence

1/4/2019 Response: Petition Civil Harassment/Workplace Violence

Minute Order

12/20/2018 Minute Order

Order

12/19/2018 Order

Notice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment

11/28/2018 Notice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment

Order: Temporary Restraining Order

11/28/2018 Order: Temporary Restraining Order

Request: Restraining Order

11/26/2018 Request: Restraining Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/26/2018 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration: In Support

11/26/2018 Declaration: In Support

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV; Department: Department 79; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Heard: Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV; Department: Department 79; Time: 9:15AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: Yancey Silvas,; Comment: CH116...on Request to Continue Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV; Department: Department 79; Time: 9:15AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request to Continue/Reissue TRO HR; Filed By: Yancey Silvas, Tony Travis,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Personal; Filed By: Yancey Silvas,; Comment: CH-110; CH-100; CH-109; CH-120; CH-116

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Response: Petition Civil Harassment/Workplace Violence; Filed By: Tony Travis,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV; Department: Department 79; Time: 9:15AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: Yancey Silvas, Tony Travis,; Comment: (p) c/f 12/19/18 per ch116

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Temporary Restraining Order; Filed By: Yancey Silvas,; Comment: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment; Filed By: Yancey Silvas,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: Yancey Silvas,; Comment: RE:CV5014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Yancey Silvas,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Restraining Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less