This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 19:08:04 (UTC).

Yajaira Barcenas vs Angel Moreno

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 Yajaira Barcenas filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Angel Moreno. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8685

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yajaira Barcenas

Defendant

Angel Moreno

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katherine Manning

 

Court Documents

Order: Restraining Order After Hearing

9/30/2019 Order: Restraining Order After Hearing

Order

9/9/2019 Order

Declaration: In Support

9/5/2019 Declaration: In Support

Declaration: In Support

8/30/2019 Declaration: In Support

Minute Order

8/26/2019 Minute Order

Declaration: In Support

8/21/2019 Declaration: In Support

Proof of Service: Mail

8/21/2019 Proof of Service: Mail

Substitution: Attorney

8/20/2019 Substitution: Attorney

Minute Order

6/12/2019 Minute Order

Minute Order

5/8/2019 Minute Order

Notice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment

4/15/2019 Notice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment

Request: Restraining Order

4/15/2019 Request: Restraining Order

Court Trial: Long Cause

9/30/2019 Court Trial: Long Cause

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Yajaira Barcenas,; Comment: POS of witness list

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Yajaira Barcenas,; Comment: POS confidential

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Court Trial: Long Cause; Department: Department 16; Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Restraining Order After Hearing; Filed By: Yajaira Barcenas, Angel Moreno,; Comment: 3-yr/exp: 09/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketDescription: Brief: Trial; Filed By: Yajaira Barcenas,; Comment: Exhibit and witness list

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Yajaira Barcenas,; Comment: POS Mail with confidential cover

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: Yajaira Barcenas,; Comment: on Request to keep minor's information confidential GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: Yajaira Barcenas,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketDescription: Request; Filed By: Yajaira Barcenas,; Comment: to keep Minor's information confidential

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Comment: REDACTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV; Department: Department 5; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketDescription: Order: Restraining Order After Hearing; Filed By: Yajaira Barcenas,; Comment: GRANTED - Cont to 06-11-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Personal; Filed By: Yajaira Barcenas,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Restraining Order; Comment: REDACTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketDescription: Order: Temporary Restraining Order; Filed By: Yajaira Barcenas,; Comment: GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Yajaira Barcenas,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: Yajaira Barcenas,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment; Filed By: Yajaira Barcenas,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketDescription: Request: Restraining Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Manning, Katherine