This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/13/2022 at 01:13:55 (UTC).

Xiaoxiao Huang vs Victoria Vasquez et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 Xiaoxiao Huang filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Victoria Vasquez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1981

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Xiaoxiao Huang

Defendants

Victoria Vasquez

Enterprise Rent-A-Car

 

Court Documents

Fee Waiver Order-Grant

8/15/2022 Fee Waiver Order-Grant

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/15/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

8/15/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

8/15/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

8/22/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

8/22/2022 Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/22/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 1:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Xiaoxiao Huang,; Comment: 1ST AMENDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee; Filed By: Xiaoxiao Huang,; Comment: 1ST AMENDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Xiaoxiao Huang,; Comment: 1ST AMENDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Xiaoxiao Huang,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Xiaoxiao Huang,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Xiaoxiao Huang,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Application; Filed By: Xiaoxiao Huang,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Order-Grant; Filed By: Xiaoxiao Huang,; Comment: granted by clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR is a litigant