This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/12/2018 at 19:22:00 (UTC).

Worku & Caalim Vs El Camino Hospital Inc

Case Summary

On 09/21/2001 Worku Caalim filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against El Camino Hospital Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3137

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Worku Debebe

Caalim Ednalyn

Defendants

Cbsj Financial Corp

Srv Jones James (Pres)

Griego Phillip & Assoc Corp

Srv Griego Phillip

El Camino Real Hospital Inc

Srv Domanico Lee (Chief/Ofcr)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2002
  • DocketClaim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Fale Medical Bill 11/00' Result Date = 01/29/2002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2002
  • DocketDocument: Other - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Fale Medical Bill 11/00' Decision = M Closed = 01/28/2002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2002
  • DocketJudgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = Document -- Judgment for Defendant. Operator: HD Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed Plaintiff: Ednalyn Caalim And Debebe Worku Defendant(S): Greigo Philip & Assoc;El Caminio Hospital And Defendant(S): Cbsj Financial Corp Comment: Motion For Judgement On The Pleading Denied; All Notified By Mail On 1/28/02 Legacy Name = Judgment Decision = M Closed = 01/28/2002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2002
  • DocketJudgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = Document -- Judgment Contested -- Small Claims. Operator: HD Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed By: James Madden Principal And Costs: Principal: $0.00 Costs: $0.00 Total Costs: $0.00 Comment: Party Name: Principal And Costs: Principal Amount: $0.00 Costs: $0.00 Total Costs: $0.00 Comment: None Party Name: Payment: Date: No Date, Payment Amount: $0.00 Other: Mailed Date: No Date Legacy Name = Judgment Decision = M Closed = 01/28/2002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2002
  • DocketDocument: Other - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = Document -- Appearance Minutes. Operator: HD Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed By: Commissioner James Madden Party Name: Ednalyn Caalim And Debebe Worku Party Name: El Camino Real Hospital By Mae Area And Party Name: Griego Phillip & Assoc By Greigo Phillp;Cbsj Finan- Party Name: Cial By James Jones Proceedings: Date: No Date, Time: No Time -- Minutes Are Recorded As Follows: Submission To Court Comment: Declaration Of Authority To Rerpesent A Party Filed Defendents Motion For Judgement On Pleading Submitt Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 01/28/2002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2002
  • DocketNot Active - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = Hearing Result Posting -- Date: No Date, Time: 08:30, Dept: 86, Operator: HD Bail Amount: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 01/28/2002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2001
  • DocketClaim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Fale Medical Bill 11/00' Continuance Scheduled For: 01/28/2002 Result Date = 12/17/2001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2001
  • DocketDocument: Other - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Fale Medical Bill 11/00' Continuance Scheduled For: 01/28/2002 Decision = M Closed = 12/17/2001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2001
  • DocketDocument: Other - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = Document -- Appearance Minutes. Operator: HD Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed By: Commissioner Lisa Steingart Party Name: Ednalyn Caalim And Debebe Worku Party Name: El Camino Hospital Party Name: James Jones For Cbsj Financial Corp;Philip Griego Proceedings: Date: 01/28/2002, Time: 01:00PM -- Minutes Are Recorded As Follows: Request Made By Plaintiff Comment: All Parties Notified By Mail On 12/17/01 Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 12/17/2001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2001
  • DocketNot Active - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = Hearing Result Posting -- Date: No Date, Time: 08:30, Dept: 86, Operator: HD Bail Amount: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 12/17/2001

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2001
  • DocketProof of Service - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = Document -- Proof of Service On. Description: Def: Griego (Receptionish)Improper Srv Operator: JG Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed Legacy Name = Proof of Service-Small Claims Decision = M Closed = 11/07/2001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2001
  • DocketNot Active - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = Hearing -- Date: 12/17/2001, Time: 08:30 SC01 Small Claims-Converted Legacy Document 3B. Dept: 86 Operator: CW Fee Amount: $0.00, Bail Amount: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 11/05/2001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2001
  • DocketClaim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Fale Medical Bill 11/00' Result Date = 11/05/2001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2001
  • DocketDocument: Other - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Fale Medical Bill 11/00' Decision = M Closed = 10/29/2001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2001
  • DocketDocument: Other - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = Document -- Appearance Minutes. Operator: CW Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed By: Commissioner Lisa Steingart Party Name: Caalim Ednalyn And Worku Debebe Party Name: El Camino Real Hospital By Stacey Repilim And Party Name: Griego Phillip & Assoc By James Jones Proceedings: Date: 12/17/2001, Time: 08:30AM -- Minutes Are Recorded As Follows: Court Convened Request Made By Plaintiff Comment: Ntc Mailed All Parties 10/29/01.Dec Of Auth Reprsnt Filed. Pltf To Srv Propr Person For G&P Assoc. Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 10/29/2001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2001
  • DocketNot Active - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = Hearing Result Posting -- Date: , Time: 08:30, Dept: 86, Operator: CW Bail Amount: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 10/29/2001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2001
  • DocketProof of Service - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = Document -- Proof of Service On. Description: Def: Jones 9/24 (Bad Serve) Operator: JG Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed Legacy Name = Proof of Service-Small Claims Decision = M Closed = 09/24/2001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2001
  • DocketProof of Service - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = Document -- Proof of Service On. Description: Def Griego (Bad/Svc) 9/24/01 Operator: JG Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed Legacy Name = Proof of Service-Small Claims Decision = M Closed = 09/24/2001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2001
  • DocketNot Active - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = Hearing -- Date: 10/29/2001, Time: 08:30 SC01 Small Claims-Converted Legacy Document 3B. Dept: 86 Operator: Fee Amount: $0.00, Bail Amount: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 09/21/2001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2001
  • DocketNot Active - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = Complaint -- SCMN Money-Converted Legacy Document 1A. Dept: Not Specified, Operator: JG Fee Amount: $20.00, Complaint Amount: $928.75 Case Does Not Involve a Military Party Complaint Summons Not Issued Number of Additional Unidentified Persons Potentially Affected by Judgment: 0 Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 09/21/2001

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Golden State Collections, LLC is a litigant