This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 05:04:29 (UTC).

Workforce Defense League et al vs Fairfield Development L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2022 Workforce Defense League filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Fairfield Development L P. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4064

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Workforce Defense League

Defendants

Fairfield Development L.P.

Trencore Plastering, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrea C Matsuoka

Defendant Attorney

Thomas W Kovacich

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

2/1/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

2/1/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/7/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/9/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/29/2022 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Request: Dismissal

5/27/2022 Request: Dismissal

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

2/1/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

2/1/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/7/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/9/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/29/2022 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Request: Dismissal

5/27/2022 Request: Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Workforce Defense League,; Comment: Plaintiff's Request For Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Fairfield Development L.P. ,; Comment: to Complaint, by Atty. Kovacich

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Comment: Plaintiff's Proof of Service of Defendant Trencore Plastering, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Comment: Plaintiff Proof of Service of Defendant Fairfield Development

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Workforce Defense League,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Workforce Defense League,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Workforce Defense League,; Comment: Complaint for Unpaid Wages Owed to Wage Claimants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less