Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:42:21 (UTC).

Wilshire Commercial Capital, LLC dba Wilshire Consumer Credit vs Charles Martinez, Jr.

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Wilshire Commercial Capital, LLC dba Wilshire Consumer Credit filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Charles Martinez, Jr. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2426

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilshire Commercial Capital, LLC dba Wilshire Consumer Credit

Defendant

Martinez, Charles, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alexandryan, Edit

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Declaration: In Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Declaration: In Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Default Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: ***PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Original Type: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: Notice: Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less