Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 04:51:22 (UTC).

Willie Menchaca vs Debi Guerrero et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2016 Willie Menchaca filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Debi Guerrero. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Steingart, Lisa and Caudill, Thomas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5372

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Steingart, Lisa

Caudill, Thomas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Menchaca, Willie David

Defendants

Guerrero, Debi

N.P. First Community Housing

First Community Housing

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Caudill, Thomas; Judgment Type: Small Claims Dismissal - other (SC); Party: Names: Menchaca, Willie David; Guerrero, Debi; First Community Housing; Comment: No appearance at hearing. Case dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Judgment Type: Small Claims Dismissal - other (SC); Comment: Comment (Dismissed with prejudice in court as to Debi Guerrero only. Matter cont'd to 10/05/16.); Party: Name: Guerrero, Debi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Caudill, Thomas; Hearing Time: 6:00 PM; Result: Not Held; Comment: Trial continued by the Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Caudill, Thomas; Hearing Time: 6:00 PM; Result: Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Proof of Service: Substituted - Comment: on Michael Cintero

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Proof of Service: Substituted - Comment: on Debi Sester-Guerrero

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: POS of Small Claims Subpoena on Jose Garcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: POS of Small Claims Subpoena on Amanda Parks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant - Comment: as to Filing papers in Superior Court and giving notices and certificates. - Commissioner Steven L. Yep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less