This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:30:55 (UTC).

Williams v. Ryder System, Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 09/12/2017 Williams filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Ryder System, Inc . This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Walsh, Brian C. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5763

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Walsh, Brian C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Williams, Mercedes

Defendants

Ryder Intergrated Logistics, Inc

Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.

Ryder Services Corporation

Ryder Dedicated Logistics, Inc.

RYDER SYSTEMS, INC.

Ryder Fleet Products, Inc

Other

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Setareh, Shaun

Leviant, Howard Scott

Defendant Attorneys

Matheke, Mara D

Curtis, Mara Danielle

Other Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Dismissal - Entire Action

Dismissal Without Prejudice of Entire Action: Comment: Dismissal of Entire Action Without Prejudice

Notice

Notice CMC reset from 5-31-19 to 6-28-19: Comment: CMC reset from 5/31/19 to 6/28/19

Hearing: Petition Compel Arbitration

Order re Stip to Continue Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Deft's Mtn Compel Arb: Motion Compel Arbitration: Evidence: Memorandum Points and Authorities: 8-17-2018-Proposed Order: Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration: Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration: Judicial Officer: Walsh, Brian C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Motion by Defendants Ryder System, Inc., Ryder Dedicated Logistics, Inc., Ryder Fleet Products, Inc., Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., Ryder Services Corporation, and Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. to Compel Arbitration (moving papers due by 6/27/18; opposition papers due by 7/25/18; reply papers due by 8/10/18; see Order entered 6/20/18).

Notice

Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration: Comment: Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration

Notice

Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration: Comment: Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

Memorandum Points and Authorities: Comment: 8/17/18

Evidence

Evidence: Comment: Compendium of Evidence (8/17/18)

Motion: Compel

Motion Compel Arbitration: Comment: Motion to Compel Arbitration (8/17/18, 9am, D1)

Order

Order re Stip to Continue Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Deft's Mtn Compel Arb: Comment: Order re Stipulation to Continue the Briefing Schedule and Hearing re Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration - signed/BCW

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex & Staying Discovery: Guidelines for Motions relating to Class Certification: Comment: ...and Staying Discovery - signed/BCW

Notice

Civil Lawsuit Notice: ADR CV-5003: Comment: Civil Lawsuit Notice (1st CMC set for 1/5/18 at 10am in D1; assigned to Hon. Brian C. Walsh)

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Order to Consolidate CMCs: Comment: Stipulation & Order to Consolidate Case Management Conferences - signed/BCW

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service Summons DLR (Civil):

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex & Staying Discovery: Guidelines for Motions relating to Class Certification: Comment: ...and Staying Discovery - signed/BCW

Notice

Civil Lawsuit Notice: ADR CV-5003: Comment: Civil Lawsuit Notice (1st CMC set for 1/5/18 at 10am in D1; assigned to Hon. Brian C. Walsh)

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons: Comment: Summons of Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet: Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complex Litigation: Provisional

Complex Litigation Provisional: Comment: Complaint

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Walsh, Brian C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: (2nd CMC) Proposed Class Action * Employment * Discovery stayed, as of 9/26/17, when the case was deemed complex. Case is stayed, as of 10/23/18, pending completion of arbitration.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Dismissal - Entire Action - Dismissal Without Prejudice of Entire Action: Comment: Dismissal of Entire Action Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice CMC reset from 5-31-19 to 6-28-19: Comment: CMC reset from 5/31/19 to 6/28/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing: Petition Compel Arbitration - Order re Stip to Continue Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Deft's Mtn Compel Arb: Motion Compel Arbitration: Evidence: Memorandum Points and Authorities: 8-17-2018-Proposed Order: Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration: Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration: Judicial Officer: Walsh, Brian C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Motion by Defendants Ryder System, Inc., Ryder Dedicated Logistics, Inc., Ryder Fleet Products, Inc., Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., Ryder Services Corporation, and Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. to Compel Arbitration (moving papers due by 6/27/18; opposition papers due by 7/25/18; reply papers due by 8/10/18; see Order entered 6/20/18).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice CMC reset from 10-26-18 to 5-31-19: Comment: CMC reset from 10/26/18 to 5/31/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Order Approving Stipulation and Ordering Plaintiff's Individual Claims to Arbitration: Comment: Order Approving Stipulation and Ordering Plaintiff's Individual Claims to Arbitration - signed/BCW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Joint CMC Statement: Comment: Case Management Conference Statement in Case no 17-CV-315763 and 17-CV-319045

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order - Stipulation Staying Action Pending Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims: Comment: Stipulation Staying Action Pending Completion of the Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Order and Notice of Rescheduled Hearing from 9-14-18 to 10-26-18: Comment: Order & Notice of Rescheduled Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration (from 9/14/18 to 10/26/18) - signed/BCW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice CMC reset from 9-14-18 to 10-26-18: Comment: CMC reset from 9/14/18 to 10/26/18

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice CMC reset from 3-9-18 to 4-6-18: Comment: CMC reset from 3/9/18 to 4/6/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: Appearance - Notice Appearance:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice CMC reset from 1-5-18 to 3-9-18: Comment: CMC reset from 1/5/18 to 3/9/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order to Consolidate CMCs: Comment: Stipulation & Order to Consolidate Case Management Conferences - signed/BCW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service Summons DLR (Civil):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: Deeming Case Complex - Order Deeming Case Complex & Staying Discovery: Guidelines for Motions relating to Class Certification: Comment: ...and Staying Discovery - signed/BCW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Civil Lawsuit Notice: ADR CV-5003: Comment: Civil Lawsuit Notice (1st CMC set for 1/5/18 at 10am in D1; assigned to Hon. Brian C. Walsh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Summons: Comment: Summons of Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet: Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complex Litigation: Provisional - Complex Litigation Provisional: Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less