This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/21/2022 at 21:32:58 (UTC).

WESTERN DIGITAL CORPORATION vs FRANCISCO HENRIQUEZ et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 WESTERN DIGITAL CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FRANCISCO HENRIQUEZ. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1723

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN DIGITAL CORPORATION

Defendants

FRANCISCO JAVIER HENRIQUEZ

PRUDENTIAL OVERALL SUPPLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory F. Johnsen

Defendant Attorney

Laurie Jayne Elza

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/17/2021 Minute Order

Clerk Rejection Letter

8/17/2021 Clerk Rejection Letter

Statement: Case Management Conference

8/10/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Clerk Rejection Letter

7/26/2021 Clerk Rejection Letter

Notice: Related Cases

7/21/2021 Notice: Related Cases

Statement: Case Management Conference

7/20/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/12/2021 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/6/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/6/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: WESTERN DIGITAL CORPORATION,; Comment: #7032387 Stipulation and Order to Consolidate- please separate Stipulation and Declaration. In addition, please file into potential LEAD case. Proof of Service is missing caption information.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: WESTERN DIGITAL CORPORATION,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: WESTERN DIGITAL CORPORATION,; Comment: #6903438 Stipulation and Order- documents are combined, missing the filing fee, and missing Proposed Order Cover Sheet. There are two Proposed Orders (one included in the Stipulation).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Related Cases; Filed By: WESTERN DIGITAL CORPORATION,; Comment: 20CV368864

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: FRANCISCO HENRIQUEZ, PRUDENTIAL OVERALL SUPPLY,; Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: FRANCISCO HENRIQUEZ, PRUDENTIAL OVERALL SUPPLY,; Comment: to Complaint by Atty. Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: WESTERN DIGITAL CORPORATION,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: WESTERN DIGITAL CORPORATION,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: WESTERN DIGITAL CORPORATION,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Western Digital Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Prudential Overall Supply is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELZA, LAURIE J.