This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:30:18 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. vs Jay Srinivasan

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Wells Fargo Bank, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jay Srinivasan. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1847

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Defendant

Srinivasan, Jay R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reese, Harlan Michael

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Srinivasan, Jay R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Request: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • General Denial: Limited >$10K to $25K - Comment: Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: against: Jay R Srinivasan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less