Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:42:06 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. vs ERIKA BRYANT

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ERIKA BRYANT. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2413

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendant

BRYANT, ERIKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reese, Harlan Michael

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2019
  • Affidavit - Comment: CASE SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Default Pending - Comment: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: ATTORNEY FEE DECLARATION CCP ??585 (a)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Affidavit - Comment: DECLARATION RE: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: **PENDING**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: ***PENDING***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Default Entered - Comment: e-serve #2772800

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Affidavit: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less