Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:42:18 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. vs BARBARA DE LUCIA

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BARBARA DE LUCIA. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2425

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendants

DE LUCIA, BARBARA GOULD

Gould, Barbara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Samtani, Shiv

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: ***PENDING*** ORDER ACCEPTING IMAGED DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS UNDER EVIDENCE CODE 1553

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP ??585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Affidavit - Comment: DECLARATION RE: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: ATTORNEY FEE DECLARATION CCP ??585 (a)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Affidavit - Comment: CASE SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Default Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: ***PENDING***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Default Entered - Comment: Basic only (e-serve 05/08/19 #2856951)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Affidavit: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less