This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:46:30 (UTC).

Wei-Hwa Gu vs Yen-Huoy Yang

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Wei-Hwa Gu filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Yen-Huoy Yang. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott, Stuart J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3871

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Scott, Stuart J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gu, Wei-Hwa

Respondent

Yang, Yen-Huoy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • Notice: Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Notice: Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Conference: Status - Judicial Officer: Scott, Stuart J; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: (p) re: requesting property mediation; set by non-agreement-pjn;c/f 8/1-ym

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: (r) sep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: (r) com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: (p) com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Notice: Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2018
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Letter for FL-120...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Response: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Responsive Declaration to Request for Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less