This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 21:11:42 (UTC).

Waverley Residential, LLC vs S.B.C.C., Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 Waverley Residential, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against S B C C , Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie, Folan, Maureen A and Takaichi, Drew C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6854

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Folan, Maureen A

Takaichi, Drew C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Waverley Residential, LLC

Pac Con Glazing, Inc.

Pacific Sash and Design

Fleetwood Windows & Doors

Phillip Murray Construction

Fleetwood Aluminium Products, Inc.

Woodshed Development

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

South Bay Construction

S.B.C.C., Inc.

Fleetwood Windows & Doors

Fleetwood Aluminium Products, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Keiley, Anthony James, III

Murphy, Andrew Kentaro

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Wilgus, David Scott

Finn, Richard Joseph

Genge, Emily G.

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Murphy, Andrew Kentaro

Wilgus, David Scott

Finn, Richard Joseph

Genge, Emily G.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketConference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Takaichi, Drew C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: DEFENDANT S.B.C.C., INC. dba SOUTH BAY CONSTRUCTION'S CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint - Comment: of Fleetwood Aluminium Products. Atty Murphy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Comment: to Cross-Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Cross-Complaint. Atty Murphy

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketAdvance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant's Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint - Comment: of S.B.C.C., Inc. Atty Genge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Comment: to Cross-Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketExhibit List (Party) - Comment: Exhibit B to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Waverley Residential, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where S.B.C.C., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fleetwood Aluminum Products, Inc. is a litigant