This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 00:05:08 (UTC).

Wang, et al. v. Art of Reflexology Milpitas, LLC, et al.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2015 Wang filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Art of Reflexology Milpitas, LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirwan, Peter, Arand, Mary E and Walsh, Brian C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3659

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirwan, Peter

Arand, Mary E

Walsh, Brian C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Xuehua Wang

Wenwei Gu

Gu, Wenwei

Wang, Xuehua

Defendants

Art Of Reflexology Milpitas, Llc

Art Of Reflexology Hayward, Llc

Art Of Reflexology Newark, Llc

Art Of Reflexology Quick Fix San Bruno, Llc

Art Of Reflexology San Francisco, Llc

Art Of Reflexology Tracy, Llc

Art Of Relfexology Richmond, Llc

Chiu Hung Lam

Wah Yiu Lee

Art Of Reflexology Quick Fix Daily City, Llc

Lee, Wah Yiu

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Lam, Chiu Hung

Lau, Ching Yu

Susan Lam

Art of Reflexology LLC

Other

Superior Court of California County of Santa Clara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

X. Young Lai

586 N. 1St Street, Suite 213B

San Jose, CA 95112

Lai, X. Young

Defendant Attorney

Tragarz, Nancy Renne

Other Attorneys

Wu, Sam Xiong-Jie

 

Court Documents

Motion: Stay

Motion Stay HRG 9-20-19: Comment: Motion to Stay Proceedings HRG 9/20/19

Order

Order After HRG 8-2-19: Comment: Order After Hearing on 8/2/19 [Motion by Plaintiffs for Terminating Sanctions] - signed/BCW

Motion: Sanctions

Order Submitted Matter HRG 5-10-19: Message to All Counsel Confirming Receipt of Wah Yiu Lee s deposition transcript (Volume II, dated J: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MO: HRG 8-2-19 Plaintiff' Supplemental Brief for Motion for Sanc: HRG 8-2-19 Declaration of Liao: HRG 8-2-19 Declaration of Xu: HRG 8-2-19 Declaration of Xiao: HRG 8-2-19 Declaration of Wang: Defendants' Supplemental Reply Brief in Response to Plaintif: HRG 8-2-19 Plaintiffs' Replying Supplemental Brief: Minutes Non-Criminal - Mtn Sanctions: Judicial Officer: Walsh, Brian C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (Continued from 5/10/19) Motion by Plaintiffs for Terminating Sanctions, or, alternatively, Issue or Evidentiary Sanctions against All Defendants and Monetary Sanctions in the amount of $7,275 against Defendants Chiu Hung Lam aka Susan Lam, Wah Yiu Lee and their Counsel, Jointly and Severally, for Violation of the Court's June 16, 2018 Order to Produce All Responsive Documents

Conference: Case Management

HRG 8-2-19 Joint Case Management Statement: Notice of Stay of Proceedings: Minutes Non-Criminal - CMC: Judicial Officer: Walsh, Brian C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Parties to exchange settlement offers by 5/17/19. Ch. 7 bankrupty filing by Art of Reflexology Newark, LLC was filed on 7/30/19.

Minute Order

Minutes Non-Criminal - Mtn Sanctions:

Notice

Tentative Ruling HRG 8-2-19: Comment: Tentative Ruling for Hearing on 8/2/19

Notice

Notice of Stay of Proceedings: Comment: Notice of Stay of Proceedings

Statement: Case Management Conference

HRG 8-2-19 Joint Case Management Statement: Comment: HRG 8-2-19 Joint Case Management Statement

Response/Reply

HRG 8-2-19 Plaintiffs' Replying Supplemental Brief: Comment: HRG 8-2-19 Plaintiffs' Replying Supplemental Brief

91 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion: Stay - Order After HRG 8-2-19: Motion Stay HRG 9-20-19: Judicial Officer: Walsh, Brian C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Motion by Defendants to Stay Proceedings. Moving papers due 8/16/19; opposition due 8/30/19; reply due 9/9/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion: Stay - Motion Stay HRG 9-20-19: Comment: Motion to Stay Proceedings HRG 9/20/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order - Minutes Non-Criminal - CMC:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Order After HRG 8-2-19: Comment: Order After Hearing on 8/2/19 [Motion by Plaintiffs for Terminating Sanctions] - signed/BCW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion: Sanctions - Order Submitted Matter HRG 5-10-19: Message to All Counsel Confirming Receipt of Wah Yiu Lee s deposition transcript (Volume II, dated J: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MO: HRG 8-2-19 Plaintiff' Supplemental Brief for Motion for Sanc: HRG 8-2-19 Declaration of Liao: HRG 8-2-19 Declaration of Xu: HRG 8-2-19 Declaration of Xiao: HRG 8-2-19 Declaration of Wang: Defendants' Supplemental Reply Brief in Response to Plaintif: HRG 8-2-19 Plaintiffs' Replying Supplemental Brief: Minutes Non-Criminal - Mtn Sanctions: Judicial Officer: Walsh, Brian C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (Continued from 5/10/19) Motion by Plaintiffs for Terminating Sanctions, or, alternatively, Issue or Evidentiary Sanctions against All Defendants and Monetary Sanctions in the amount of $7,275 against Defendants Chiu Hung Lam aka Susan Lam, Wah Yiu Lee and their Counsel, Jointly and Severally, for Violation of the Court's June 16, 2018 Order to Produce All Responsive Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Conference: Case Management - HRG 8-2-19 Joint Case Management Statement: Notice of Stay of Proceedings: Minutes Non-Criminal - CMC: Judicial Officer: Walsh, Brian C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Parties to exchange settlement offers by 5/17/19. Ch. 7 bankrupty filing by Art of Reflexology Newark, LLC was filed on 7/30/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order - Minutes Non-Criminal - Mtn Sanctions:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Tentative Ruling HRG 8-2-19: Comment: Tentative Ruling for Hearing on 8/2/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice of Stay of Proceedings: Comment: Notice of Stay of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
164 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2015
  • Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter Fee < 1 Hour Decision = M Closed = 10/06/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = AMENDED Demurrer to Complaint 11/17/15 @ 9:00AM D-09 Atty Wu Legacy Name = CV Demurrer w/fees Decision = M Closed = 10/06/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter Fee < 1 Hour Decision = M Closed = 09/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = to Complaint; Memo of p's & a's Atty: Sam X. Wu, (909) 396-4642 10/20/15, 9am, D9 Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Demurrer, Unltd Decision = M Closed = 09/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter Fee < 1 Hour Decision = M Closed = 09/01/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = 10-20-15, 9am, d.9; atty wu Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Demurrer, Unltd Decision = M Closed = 09/01/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint: Amendment To (New Party) - Complaint Amendment To (New Party): Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = Naming DOE 1 as Art Of Reflexology Quick Fix Daily City, LLC. Legacy Name = CV Amendment to Complaint Decision = M Closed = 07/30/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 07/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 07/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 07/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less