This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 02:26:26 (UTC).

WALI MOMAND et al vs STEPHANIE COLBERT et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 WALI MOMAND filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STEPHANIE COLBERT. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2249

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WALI MOMAND

MOMAND NAJLA

AHMAD WALI MOMAND

AHMAD NADIEM DANIEL MOHMAND

Defendants

STEPHANIE COLBERT

SHERRY NGUYEN

FRIT SAN JOSE TOWN AND COUNTRY VILLAGE, LLC

GREYSTAR CALIFORNIA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Harris Wolff

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher E. Brumfiel

Jefferson Matthew Shelton

Richard Stephen Endres

 

Court Documents

Notice

2/3/2022 Notice

Notice

12/14/2021 Notice

Proof of Service

12/14/2021 Proof of Service

Conference: Further Case Management

4/12/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

4/12/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

4/12/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

5/11/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/11/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

5/11/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Demand: Jury Trial

7/6/2021 Demand: Jury Trial

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/6/2021 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Electronic

8/12/2021 Proof of Service: Electronic

Request: Dismissal

8/12/2021 Request: Dismissal

Proof of Service: Electronic

8/13/2021 Proof of Service: Electronic

Declaration

11/18/2021 Declaration

Declaration

11/18/2021 Declaration

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

11/18/2021 Memorandum: Points and Authorities

Motion: Protective Order

11/18/2021 Motion: Protective Order

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • HearingDescription: Motion: Protective Order; Department: Department 2; Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: Handling Atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: WALI MOMAND, MOMAND NAJLA, AHMAD MOMAND, AHMAD NADIEM DANIEL MOHMAND,; Comment: amended notice of motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: WALI MOMAND, MOMAND NAJLA, AHMAD MOMAND, AHMAD NADIEM DANIEL MOHMAND,; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion: Protective Order; Filed By: WALI MOMAND, MOMAND NAJLA, AHMAD MOMAND, AHMAD NADIEM DANIEL MOHMAND,; Comment: Hrg 3-29-22 D2 Limiting Discovery, to Quash Service of Subpoenas and for Sancts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum: Points and Authorities; Filed By: WALI MOMAND, MOMAND NAJLA, AHMAD MOMAND, AHMAD NADIEM DANIEL MOHMAND,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: WALI MOMAND, MOMAND NAJLA, AHMAD MOMAND, AHMAD NADIEM DANIEL MOHMAND,; Comment: OF ANDREW WOLFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: WALI MOMAND, MOMAND NAJLA, AHMAD MOMAND, AHMAD NADIEM DANIEL MOHMAND,; Comment: OF DUNCAN McGEE NEFCYESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: WALI MOMAND, MOMAND NAJLA, AHMAD MOMAND, AHMAD NADIEM DANIEL MOHMAND,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: WALI MOMAND, MOMAND NAJLA, AHMAD MOMAND, AHMAD NADIEM DANIEL MOHMAND,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: WALI MOMAND, MOMAND NAJLA, AHMAD MOMAND, AHMAD NADIEM DANIEL MOHMAND,; Comment: of Claim for Punitive Damages as to FRIT San Jose Town and Country Village, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: WALI MOMAND, MOMAND NAJLA, AHMAD MOMAND, AHMAD NADIEM DANIEL MOHMAND,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: STEPHANIE COLBERT, SHERRY NGUYEN,; Comment: to Complaint by defs. Nguyen and Colbert thru Atty. Brunfiel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Demand: Jury Trial; Filed By: STEPHANIE COLBERT, SHERRY NGUYEN,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: STEPHANIE COLBERT, SHERRY NGUYEN,; Comment: $150.00 Jury fee paid by defs. Nguyen and Colbert

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: WALI MOMAND, MOMAND NAJLA, AHMAD MOMAND, AHMAD NADIEM DANIEL MOHMAND,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: WALI MOMAND, MOMAND NAJLA, AHMAD MOMAND, AHMAD NADIEM DANIEL MOHMAND,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: WALI MOMAND, MOMAND NAJLA, AHMAD MOMAND, AHMAD NADIEM DANIEL MOHMAND,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less