Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 15:09:34 (UTC).

W. Thomas Vs C. Ying

Case Summary

On 06/16/2008 W Thomas filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against C Ying. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Yep, Steven L, Madden, James P, Berry, Frank, Jr., Healy, Nicole, Lin, Wen-Ching and Sevey, James. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5384

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Yep, Steven L

Madden, James P

Berry, Frank, Jr.

Healy, Nicole

Lin, Wen-Ching

Sevey, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wen-Chi Thomas

Los Altos, CA 94024

Thomas, Wen-Chi

Defendants

Zhong Ying Chen

Sunnyvale, CA 94086

Wenhong Xia

Monterey Park, CA 91754

Xia, Wenhong

Chen, Zhong Ying

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2012
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Chen, Zhong Ying; Party: Name: Thomas, Wen-Chi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Chen, Zhong Ying; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Thomas, Wen-Chi; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Thomas, Wen-Chi; Judgment Amount: $3,050.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Chen, Zhong Ying; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $50.00; Other: $3,000.00; Total: $3050.00; Comment: printdate=Jul 2 2012; origjudgdate=Apr 9 2012; judgstatusdate=Jul 2 2012; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2008
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Chen, Zhong Ying; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Thomas, Wen-Chi; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec/Rtn Fully Satis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • Satisfaction - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ord:Satisfaction of Jgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • Order: Request for Court Order (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = granted Legacy Name = SC Ord:Request for Court Order Decision = M Closed = 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • Request: Court Order (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Court Order & Answer Decision = M Closed = 05/02/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 04/09/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 03/05/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = P Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 06/26/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = P Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 04/27/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Sevey, James; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = P Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 02/20/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2008
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Certified Mail Returned to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2008
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Off calendar: no service - reset; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = SLY - Yep, Steven Result Date = 12/11/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2008
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Berry, Frank, Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = P Result Judge = FB - Berry, Frank Result Date = 10/03/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2008
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = P Result Judge = SLY - Yep, Steven Result Date = 08/25/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2008
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Berry, Frank, Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = P Result Date = 07/07/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2008
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 06/16/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2008
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 06/16/2008

    Read MoreRead Less