Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/20/2021 at 07:09:11 (UTC).

Vunisa v. Health Net, LLC, et al.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 Vunisa filed an Other lawsuit against Health Net, LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9187

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vunisa, Joweli

Defendants

Centene Corporation

California Health & Wellness

Health Net Community Solutions, Inc.

Health Net, LLC

Health Net of California, Inc.

Health Net Life Insurance Company

Accellion, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Blood, Timothy Gordon

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Accellion, Inc.

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Centene Corporation

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to California Health & Wellness Plan

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Health Net Community Solutions, Inc.

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Health Net Life Insurance Company

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Health Net of California, Inc.

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Health Net, LLC

Proof of Service: Mail

Proof of Service: Mail: Comment: Proof of Service: on All Defendants of Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons: Issued/Filed (Amended): Comment: (Amended)

Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 7/15/21 at 2:30pm D1; assigned to Hon. Sunil R. Kulkarni for all purposes.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet:

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons: Issued/Filed:

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies): Comment: Class Action Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Comment: (1st CMC) Proposed Class Action. Discovery and responsive pleading deadline stayed, as of 4/8/21, when the case was deemed complex.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Accellion, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Centene Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to California Health & Wellness Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Health Net Community Solutions, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Health Net Life Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Health Net of California, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Health Net, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Mail - Proof of Service: Mail: Comment: Proof of Service: on All Defendants of Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: Deeming Case Complex - Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Summons: Issued/Filed (Amended): Comment: (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Lawsuit Notice - Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 7/15/21 at 2:30pm D1; assigned to Hon. Sunil R. Kulkarni for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Summons: Issued/Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies): Comment: Class Action Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Accellion, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTH NET COMMUNITY SOLUTIONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant