This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/12/2022 at 03:56:38 (UTC).

Tecson v. Robinhood Crypto, LLC, et al.

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 Tecson filed an Other lawsuit against Robinhood Crypto, LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kuhnle, Thomas. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3584

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kuhnle, Thomas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vivian Tecson

Defendants

Robinhood Crypto, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

Robinhood Financial LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

Robinhood Markets, Inc., a Delaware corporation

Other

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zelenski, David Sohn

David Sohn Zelenski

Defendant Attorneys

Heath, Jacob Marcus

Phillips, Melanie Dawn

Jacob Marcus Heath

Melanie Dawn Phillips

Other Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Filing Notice of Removal:

Notice

Notice CMC 8-31-18 at 10am in D5: Comment: CMC set for 8/31/18 at 10am in D5

Statement: Case Management Conference

Joint CMC Statement: Comment: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Notice

Notice of Appearance: Comment: Ntc of Appearance: Attuy Heath

Notice: Entry of Order

1939939_6982018-3-12: Comment: Notice of Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex, Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline signed/TEK

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons Issued Filed:

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1911144_760SantaClar: Comment: COMPLEX

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/15/2018 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/15/2018 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/15/2018 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Notice

3/29/2018 Notice

Notice

4/4/2018 Notice

Clerk Rejection Letter

4/16/2018 Clerk Rejection Letter

Statement: Case Management Conference

6/15/2018 Statement: Case Management Conference

Minute Order

6/22/2018 Minute Order

Notice

6/25/2018 Notice

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Removal to Federal Court; Filed By: Robinhood Crypto, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Robinhood Financial LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Robinhood Markets, Inc., a Delaware corporation,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: CMC set for 8/31/18 at 10am in D5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 5; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: Vivian Tecson,; Comment: $150 jury fee for Plaintiff Tecson paid for by Atty Zelenski

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Robinhood Financial LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,; Comment: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Vivian Tecson,; Comment: $1000.00 Complex Filing Fee was already remitted on 02/20/2018. Please see reprinted receipt for details.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Robinhood Crypto, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Robinhood Financial LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Robinhood Markets, Inc., a Delaware corporation,; Comment: Ntc of Appearance: Attuy Heath

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Robinhood Crypto, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Robinhood Financial LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Robinhood Markets, Inc., a Delaware corporation,; Comment: Complex Fees $3000.00 payment on behalf of All Three defendants taken on Notice of Undocumented Action.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Vivian Tecson,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Vivian Tecson,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Vivian Tecson,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Order; Filed By: Vivian Tecson,; Comment: Notice of Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline signed/TEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Vivian Tecson,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Vivian Tecson,; Comment: COMPLEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Vivian Tecson,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

page 0 can't be parsed

page 1 can't be parsed

page 2 can't be parsed

page 3 can't be parsed

page 4 can't be parsed

page 5 can't be parsed

page 6 can't be parsed

page 7 can't be parsed

page 8 can't be parsed

page 9 can't be parsed

page 9 can't be parsed

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Robinhood Crypto, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Robinhood Markets, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Robinhood Financial LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant