Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:18:21 (UTC).

Vivian Rodriguez vs Erick Moreno

Case Summary

On 05/02/2018 Vivian Rodriguez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Erick Moreno. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1695

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rodriguez, Vivian

Respondent

Moreno, Erick R.

Minor

Moreno, Dominick C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • Request: Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less