This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/17/2021 at 06:43:26 (UTC).

Virginia La Brecque vs Gregory Sherman

Case Summary

On 12/24/2020 Virginia La Brecque filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Gregory Sherman. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Johnson, Erik S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9777

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Johnson, Erik S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

La Brecque, Virginia

Defendant

Sherman, Gregory

Other

Pretrial Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Handler, Eric Andrew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV - Judicial Officer: Johnson, Erik S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: GRANTED - Reissued from 02/23/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketRequest: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice: New Hearing Date & Order on Reissuance - Comment: REISSUED: 04/20/21 @ 9AM D4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketOrder: Proposed - Comment: *Signed. See CH-116

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV - Judicial Officer: Johnson, Erik S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketOrder: Temporary Restraining Order - Comment: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNotice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration: In Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketRequest: Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANDLER ERIC A