This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 10/07/2022 at 17:05:52 (UTC).

Vides v. Flights Restaurant Group, Inc., et al. (PAGA)

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 Vides filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Flights Restaurant Group, Inc , PAGA. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2958

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mauricio Vides

Defendants

Flights Restaurant Group, Inc.

Flights Restaurant Burlingame, Inc.

Flights Restaurant Campbell, Inc.

Flights Restaurant Los Gatos, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Norman B Blumenthal

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/9/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Lawsuit Notice

9/9/2022 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/9/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/9/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

9/15/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 3; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Mauricio Vides,; Comment: Representative Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Mauricio Vides,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * PAGA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: Civil Lawsuit Notice 1st CMC set for 1/25/23 at 2:30pm in D3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Mauricio Vides,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara