Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:40:42 (UTC).

Verna Nguyen vs Katherine Hoffman et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Verna Nguyen filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Katherine Hoffman. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Williams, Benjamin. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4992

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Williams, Benjamin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nguyen, Verna

Defendants

Harkins, Bill

Hoffman, Katherine

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Williams, Benjamin; Judgment Type: Small Claims Dismissal - other (SC); Comment: Comment (Dismissed in court without prejudice. No appearance by the Plt. No POS filed by Plt.); Party: Names: Nguyen, Verna; Hoffman, Katherine; Harkins, Bill

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Williams, Benjamin; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fee Paid $60.00 No POS as Of 09/04/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Service by clerk for certified mail, to each defendant - Comment: #70180040000031187271

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Service by clerk for certified mail, to each defendant - Comment: #70180040000031187264

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less

    Read MoreRead Less