This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:29:53 (UTC).

Verbicaro I, LLC vs Northeast Bank

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Verbicaro I, LLC filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against Northeast Bank. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1841

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Verbicaro I, LLC

Defendant

Northeast Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schumb, Christopher Ely

Defendant Attorney

Whitman, Todd Erik

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Consolidated (CV, FL, MH, PR); Party: Names: Verbicaro I, LLC; Northeast Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Order: Ex Parte - Comment: Application and stipulation to consolidate with case# 17CV318461 is GRANTED for all purposes; The lower case number is the lead case and shall be managed by Dept. 6, signed Judge Zayner.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Stipulation - Comment: Application to consolidate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Ex Parte Application - Notice Required - Comment: Application to consolidate with case# 17CV318461, by atty Schumb.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint; Atty Whitman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less