Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/06/2019 at 19:55:07 (UTC).

Venclose Inc., et al. v. Covidien LP, et al. (Lead Case) [Consolidated with Case No. 18CV327382]

Case Summary

On 09/01/2017 Venclose Inc filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Covidien LP, Lead Case Consolidated with Case No 18CV327382. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stoelker, James L, Kuhnle, Thomas and Lucas, Patricia M. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5406

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stoelker, James L

Kuhnle, Thomas

Lucas, Patricia M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Venclose Inc

Esch, Brady

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Covidien LP

Covidien Holding Inc

Other

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Thacker, J. Mark

Verrier, Lita Monique

Price, Ernest E

Hatfield, Jonathan Cody

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Sauer, Christine Yun

Other Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Notice

Notice CMC set for 7-20-18 at 10am in D5: Comment: CMC set for 7/20/18 at 10am in D5

Order: Submitted Matter

Order Submitted Matter: Comment: Order re Motion to Stay; Demurrer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint - signed/TEK

Proof of Service: Electronic

Proof of Service Electronic:

Exhibit List (Party)

Venclose - Ex. A to Amd. JCMS - 1-16-18.pdf: Comment: Exhibit A to Amendment to Joint CMC Statement

Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement Case Management Conference: Comment: Amendment to Joint Case Management Statement

Proof of Service: Electronic

Proof of Service Electronic:

Opposition/Objections

Defs' Opp. to Venclose's Req for Lim Disc.pdf: Comment: Opp to Rqst Ltd Disc

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Order CV-5063 Katherine Chok: Comment: CV-5063 Katherine Chok (CSR #9209) - signed/TEK - for hearing on 1/5/18

Proof of Service: Electronic

Proof of Service Electronic:

Exhibit List (Party)

Venclose - Ex I to FAC.pdf: Comment: Exhibit I

Exhibit List (Party)

Venclose - Ex H to FAC.pdf: Comment: Exhibit H

Exhibit List (Party)

Venclose - Ex. G, Pt 2 of 2.pdf: Comment: Exhibit G, Pt. 2 of 2

Exhibit List (Party)

Venclose - Ex. G, Pt 1 of 2.pdf: Comment: Exhibit G, Pt. 1 of 2

Exhibit List (Party)

Exhibit: Comment: Exhibit B

Exhibit List (Party)

Exhibit List (Party): Comment: Exhibit A

Complaint: Amended

Complaint First Amended: Comment: First Amended Complaint

Notice: Related Cases

Notice Related Cases: Comment: (1) Covidien LP, et al. v. Brady Esch; Case No. 1:16-cv-12410; USDC, District of MA; filed on 11/28/16 and remains pending; (2) Covidien Holding Inc., et al. v. Venclose Inc., Case No. N17C-08-081 CEB; Delaware Sup. Ct.; filed on 8/4/17 and remains pending.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Amended Civil Case Cover Sheet: Comment: AMENDED Civil Case Cover Sheet

126 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: (8th CMC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice CMC 2-7-20 at 10am in D5: Comment: CMC set for 2/7/20 at 10am in D5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Joint CMC Statement HRG 11-22-19: Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (7th CMC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - COS Ntc of Intent to Appear by Phone: Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Ntc of Intent to Appear by Phone: Comment: Notice of Intent to Appear By Telephone

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Joint CMC Statement HRG 11-22-19: Comment: HRG 11-22-19 Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice Change of Handling Attorney: Comment: Notice of Change of Handliing Attorneys

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Joint CMC Statement: CV-5100 HRG 6-17-19: Minutes Non-Criminal: Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (6th CMC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice CMC 11-22-19 at 11am in D5: Comment: CMC set for 11/22/19 at 11am in D5

    Read MoreRead Less
144 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit List (Party) - Venclose - Ex. G, Pt 1 of 2.pdf: Comment: Exhibit G, Pt. 1 of 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit List (Party) - Exhibit: Comment: Exhibit B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit List (Party) - Exhibit List (Party): Comment: Exhibit A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint: Amended - Complaint First Amended: Comment: First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketDemand: Jury Trial - Comment: Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Related Cases - Notice Related Cases: Comment: (1) Covidien LP, et al. v. Brady Esch; Case No. 1:16-cv-12410; USDC, District of MA; filed on 11/28/16 and remains pending; (2) Covidien Holding Inc., et al. v. Venclose Inc., Case No. N17C-08-081 CEB; Delaware Sup. Ct.; filed on 8/4/17 and remains pending.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Amended Civil Case Cover Sheet: Comment: AMENDED Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Venclose Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where COVIDIEN LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant