This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 01:56:07 (UTC).

Velocity Investments LLC vs. Erezo et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 Velocity Investments LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Erezo. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Manoukian, Socrates P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3627

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Manoukian, Socrates P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Velocity Investments, LLC

Goldsmith & Hull

Goldsmith, Stephen R

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

EREZO, MELISSA

EREZO, MELISSA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Goldsmith, Stephen R

Bhasker, Shalini

Nefulda, Larissa Guerrero

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Salmonsen, Matthew C

Schwinn, Fred W.

Roulston, Raeon Rodrigo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketHearing: Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Manoukian, Socrates P; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: to X-Defs. Goldsmith & Hull, APC and Stephen R. Goldmsmiths' Answer to X-Complaint by Def. Melissa Erezo (Matthew Salmonsen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketHearing: Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Manoukian, Socrates P; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: to Answer to Cross-Complaint by Def.X-Comp. Melissa Erezo (Matthew Salmonsen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DispositionJudgment - Judicial Officer: Manoukian, Socrates P; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court Ordered (CV, PR); Party: Names: Velocity Investments, LLC; EREZO, MELISSA; Goldsmith & Hull; Goldsmith, Stephen R; Velocity Investments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Comment: to Vacate Discovery Order on 10/02/20 and Dismiss All Actions is GRANTED by Judge Manoukain

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketOrder After Hearing - POS - Comment: **VACATED PER ORDER FILED 11/12/20** RE: Motion to Compel Plt./X-Def. to Provide Further Responses to the Aforementioned Discovery is GRANTED in its Entirety by Judge Manoukian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketMotion: Compel - Original Type: Motion: Compel; Judicial Officer: Manoukian, Socrates P; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Plt's Responses to Form & Special Interrogs, Sets One; Request for Production of Documents, Set One and for Monetary Sanctions by Def (Matthew C. Salmonses)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Amended Notice of Hearing - Demurerr to Answer of Velocity, 10/1/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - Comment: to X-Defs' Answer to X-Complaint; HRG 12/8/20, 9am, D20

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketDefault Not Entered - Comment: No POS010 filed for cross defendant Velocity Investments, LLC. Further, cross defendant's name is not listed in item#6(b)(2).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketClerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Env. #4229352, The civil case cover sheet is not necessary.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint - Comment: atty Schwinn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer (Limited): Up to $10K - Comment: to Complaint: atty Schwinn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: e

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint (Limited): Up to $10K - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Goldsmith & Hull, APC is a litigant

Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEFULDA LARISSA G

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDSMITH STEPHEN R