Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:44:32 (UTC).

Vasiliki Margariti et al vs Stanford Hospital et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2018 Vasiliki Margariti filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Stanford Hospital. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Pierce, Mark H and Lucas, Patricia M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2315

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Pierce, Mark H

Lucas, Patricia M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Margariti, Vasiliki

Chalikiopoulos, Leonidas

C, L

Defendants

Stuart, Elizabeth

Fang, Andrea C

Lucille Packard Childrens Hospital

Stanford Healthcare

Stanford Hospital

Dannenberg, Bernard W

Lumba, Angela Kumari

Stanford University Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pisano, Montgomery Scott

Defendant Attorney

Still, Jennifer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Margariti, Vasiliki; C, L; Stanford Hospital; Stanford Healthcare; Lucille Packard Childrens Hospital; Stanford University Medical Center; Lumba, Angela Kumari; Fang, Andrea C; Dannenberg, Bernard W; Stuart, Elizabeth; Comment: entire without prejudice by atty Pisano

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Order - Comment: Re: Def. Special Mtn. to Strike Slapp Suit - Signed by Judge Lucas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire without prejudice by atty Pisano

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Motion: Strike - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Slapp to the First Amended Complaint and for Award of Atty's Fees and Costs by Defs Stanford Health Care and Lucille Packard Children's Hospital (Jennifer Still)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Response/Reply - Comment: Response to Reply

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: Supplemental of Jennifer Still, Esq.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2019
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee - Comment: First Amended, Atty Pisano

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons and Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stanford University Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Lucile Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford is a litigant

Latest cases where STANFORD HEALTH CARE A NONPROFIT CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PISANO, MONTGOMERY S