This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 15:17:43 (UTC).

Varsity Ford vs Big Valley Ford, A California Corp.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2003 Varsity Ford filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Big Valley Ford, A California Corp. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Manoukian, Socrates P, Cabrinha, Neal A and Madden, James P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0560

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Manoukian, Socrates P

Cabrinha, Neal A

Madden, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Varsity Ford

Peninsula Ford

Defendant

Big Valley Ford, A California Corp.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2004
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Big Valley Ford, A California Corp.; Party: Name: Varsity Ford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2004
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Big Valley Ford, A California Corp.; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Varsity Ford; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Varsity Ford; Judgment Amount: $5,030.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Big Valley Ford, A California Corp.; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $30.00; Other: $5,000.00; Total: $5030.00; Comment: clerkid=283; printdate=Jan 5 2004; origjudgdate=Jan 5 2004; judgstatusdate=Jan 5 2004; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2003
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Big Valley Ford, A California Corp.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Varsity Ford; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2004
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Cabrinha, Neal A; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of Transfer of SC Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2004
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 05/28/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2004
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 05/28/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2004
  • Judgment - Judicial Officer: Cabrinha, Neal A; Comment: Text = Plaintiff Peninsula Ford take nothing by its complaint, and that defendant Big Valley Ford be dismissed with its costs of suit. Legacy Name = Judgment Decision = M Closed = 05/20/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2004
  • Trial De Novo - Original Type: Trial De Novo; Judicial Officer: Cabrinha, Neal A; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Text = ASSIGNED TO JUDGE CABRINHA DEPT. 10 Result By = C Result Judge = NAC - Cabrinha, Neal Result Date = 05/18/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2004
  • Trial De Novo - Original Type: Trial De Novo; Judicial Officer: Manoukian, Socrates P; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Vacated; Comment: Text = ASSIGNED TO JUDGE CABRINHA DEPT. 10 Result By = C Result Judge = SPM - Manoukian, Socrates Result Date = 03/05/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2004
  • Trial De Novo - Original Type: Trial De Novo; Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Vacated; Comment: Text = CONT. TO 10:00 A.M. PER ORDER Result By = C Result Date = 03/05/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2004
  • Certificate of Mailing - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2004
  • Notice: Appeal (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = Notice of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2004
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 01/05/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2003
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = Proof of Service-Small Claims Decision = M Closed = 11/13/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2003
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 11/04/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2003
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = Plaintiff's Claim(<13, non-GovAgncy) Decision = M Closed = 11/04/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BIG VALLEY FORD is a litigant