This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 05/21/2022 at 18:07:20 (UTC).

Varanice Washington vs Phelps Enterprises, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 Varanice Washington filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Phelps Enterprises, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6430

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Varanice Washington

Claimant

NATIONAL EXPRESS LLC

Defendants

Phelps Enterprises, Inc

Mathew Phelps

Antonio Montoya

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donald Eugene Patterson

Claimant Attorney

Anna Joy Monteleone

Defendant Attorney

Ashley Elizabeth Colivas

 

Court Documents

Bulk Scanned Documents

3/22/2022 Bulk Scanned Documents

Bulk Scanned Documents

3/22/2022 Bulk Scanned Documents

Bulk Scanned Documents

3/22/2022 Bulk Scanned Documents

Notice of Transfer

4/5/2022 Notice of Transfer

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Transfer; Filed By: Varanice Washington, Phelps Enterprises, Inc, Mathew Phelps, Antonio Montoya, NATIONAL EXPRESS LLC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Transfer In; Comment: **ALL FIRST PAPER FEES PAID**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Bulk Scanned Documents; Comment: Nov 08 2021 - Nov 08 2021 [Complaint]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Bulk Scanned Documents; Comment: Jan 18 2022 - Mar 01 2022 [Notice of Lien. Answer. POS 010.]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Bulk Scanned Documents; Comment: Mar 01 2022 - Mar 17 2022 [Register of Actions. Stip & Order re: transfer change.]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Express Group, PLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MONTELEONE, ANNA JOY