This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/08/2021 at 22:22:59 (UTC).

Valezca Wilson vs Cross Country Staffing et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 Valezca Wilson filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Cross Country Staffing. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie, Barrett, Thang N and Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2791

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Barrett, Thang N

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wilson, Valezca

Vers, Valezca

Defendants

Medical Staffing Network

Cross Country Staffing

Med Staff Inc.

Cross Country Staffing, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Navarette, Arthur Albert

Defendant Attorney

Markelov, Aleksandr

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketConference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: C/F 9-22-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketRestored to court's control

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketRemoval to Federal Court - Comment: by Def Cross Country Staffing, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Defendant Cross Country Staffing, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff Valezca Wilson's Complaint; Atty: Markelov

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Barrett, Thang N; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: *continued from 6-2-20*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: HRG 09-22-2020 Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medical Staffing Network is a litigant

Latest cases where Cross Country Staffing, Inc., is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARKELOV, ALEKSANDR