Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/29/2021 at 12:00:41 (UTC).

Boyer v. Lucile Salter Packard Childrens Hospital at Stanford

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 Boyer filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Lucile Salter Packard Childrens Hospital at Stanford. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lucas, Patricia M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5153

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lucas, Patricia M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boyer, Valerie

Defendant

LUCILE SALTER PACKARD CHILDRENS HOSPITAL AT STANFORD, a California corporation,

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ackermann, Craig Justin

Defendant Attorneys

Collins, Geneva A

Bruno, Michael David

Moore, Sara Allison

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Notice: Appearance

Notice: Appearance:

Proof of Service: Mail

Proof of Service: Mail: Comment: Proof of Service

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

POS.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML.

Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 4/21/21 at 2:30pm by CourtCall (D3); assigned to Hon. Patricia M. Lucas for all purposes.

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons: Issued/Filed:

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet:

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies): Comment: PLAINTIFF S CLASS ACTION AND PAGA REPRESENTATIVE COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Comment: (1st CMC) Proposed Wage and Hour Class Action; PAGA enforcement action. Discovery and responsive pleading deadline stayed, as of 1/6/21, when the case was deemed complex.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Appearance - Notice: Appearance:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Mail - Proof of Service: Mail: Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - POS.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: Deeming Case Complex - Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Lawsuit Notice - Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 4/21/21 at 2:30pm by CourtCall (D3); assigned to Hon. Patricia M. Lucas for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Summons: Issued/Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies): Comment: PLAINTIFF S CLASS ACTION AND PAGA REPRESENTATIVE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant