This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/19/2022 at 18:04:46 (UTC).

Valencia v. Mattress Firm, Inc. (PAGA)

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 Valencia filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Mattress Firm, Inc PAGA. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3324

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carmen Valencia

Defendant

Mattress Firm, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roman Otkupman

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Civil Lawsuit Notice

9/20/2022 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/20/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/20/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/20/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Order: Deeming Case Complex

9/21/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

10/5/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 3; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Carmen Valencia,; Comment: Proof of Service (PAGA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Carmen Valencia,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Carmen Valencia,; Comment: Representative Action Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Carmen Valencia,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * PAGA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: Civil Lawsuit Notice 1st CMC set for 2/8/23 at 2:30pm in D3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mattress Firm Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara