Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/04/2018 at 03:16:00 (UTC).

V. Tu'ifua, et al vs Ford Motor Company, et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2007 V Tu'ifua filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hyman, Eugene M, Murphy, Kevin J, Manoukian, Socrates P, Elfving, William J, McKenney, Kevin E, Strickland, Elizabeth, Levinger, Mary Jo and Kleinberg, James P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************7173

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hyman, Eugene M

Murphy, Kevin J

Manoukian, Socrates P

Elfving, William J

McKenney, Kevin E

Strickland, Elizabeth

Levinger, Mary Jo

Kleinberg, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

Vakafuhu Tu'Ifua

Tuna Fielakepa

Mailefihi Tu'Ipelehake

Fefita Langola Hefa

Osaiasi Tu'Ipulotu

Tu'ipelehake, Mailefihi

Tu'ifua, Vakafuhu

Fielakepa, Tuna

Hefa, Fefita Langola

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Joe Avila Silva, Jr.

Jose L Delgado

Jose L. Delgado

Edith Delgado

Ford Motor Co.

John Martin Hiss, Iii

Estate Of Vinisia Hefa

Ford Motor Company

Delgado, Jose L

Joe Silva

Custom Alignment Balance & Brakes

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Delgado, Jose L

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem Attorneys

Richard Alexander

152 North Third Street, Suite 600

San Jose, CA 95112

Philip R. Weltin

1432 Martin Luther King, Jr. Way

Oakland, CA 94612-1213

Rodney A Klein

2300 Bell Executive Lane

Sacramento, CA 95825

Weltin, Philip R.

Alexander, Richard

Klein, Rodney A

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

William F. Fitzgerald

560 Mission Street, Suite 2100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Daniel E. Winters

345 Lorton Avenue, Suite 101

Burlingame, CA 94010-4135

Lee J. Danforth

555 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 300

Redwood City, CA 94065-2133

Carbone, Mark

Frank P. Kelly

333 Bush Street, Suite 600

San Francisco, CA 94104-2828

Winters, Daniel E.

Snell & Wilmer LLP

Kelly, Frank P.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Winters, Daniel E.

Other Attorneys

Mark Carbone

505-14Th Street, Suite 600

Oakland, CA 94612

Fitzgerald, William F.

Danforth, Lee J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: Joe Silva; Party: Name: Estate Of Vinisia Hefa; Party: Name: Delgado, Edith; Party: Name: Ford Motor Co.; Party: Name: Delgado, Edith; Party: Name: Hiss, III, John Martin; Party: Name: Ford Motor Company; Party: Name: Hefa, Fefita Langola; Party: Name: Delgado, Edith; Party: Name: Hiss III, John Martin; Party: Name: Estate Of Vinisia Hefa; Party: Name: Ford Motor Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: Silva, Joe Avila, Jr.; Party: Name: Delgado, Jose L.; Party: Name: Fielakepa, Tuna; Party: Name: Tu'ipelehake, Mailefihi; Party: Name: Tu'ipelehake, Mailefihi; Party: Name: Delgado, Jose L; Party: Name: Tu'ipulotu, Osaiasi; Party: Name: Tu'ifua, Vakafuhu

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2008
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: Hiss, John Martin, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Original Type: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Judicial Officer: Levinger, Mary Jo; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Vacated; dismissal filed; Comment: Text = *as to pltf, Fefita Hefa's complaint, case #108CV102369 Only* Result By = C Result Date = 12/15/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2009
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Levinger, Mary Jo; Comment: Text = (Rodney A. Klein); **This Dismisses entire action** Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 12/15/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2009
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Levinger, Mary Jo; Comment: Text = as to complaint filed on 1/16/08 by pltfs Tuna Fielakepa and Mailefihi Tu'ipelehake. (Philip R. Weltin) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 12/10/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Levinger, Mary Jo; Comment: Text = as to x-complaints filed by Jose & Edith Delgado on 8/22/07 & 10/17/08. (Daniel W. Winters) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 12/11/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Levinger, Mary Jo; Comment: Text = re (Atty R. Alexander) Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 12/09/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Original Type: Jury Trial: Long Cause; Judicial Officer: Levinger, Mary Jo; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Vacated: settled; Comment: Text = time est. 15 days Result By = K Result Judge = MJL - Levinger, Mary Jo Result Date = 10/19/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2009
  • Conference: Settlement Jury - Original Type: Conference: Settlement Jury; Judicial Officer: Levinger, Mary Jo; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Vacated: settled; Comment: Result By = K Result Judge = MJL - Levinger, Mary Jo Result Date = 10/19/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
188 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2007
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 08/06/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2007
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 08/03/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2007
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 08/03/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2007
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Text = against The American Automobile Association, Inc. Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 08/03/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2007
  • Acknowledgement - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Acknowledge Receipt Decision = M Closed = 07/30/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2007
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/23/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem - Judicial Officer: Hyman, Eugene M; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Appl/Ord:Appt Guardian Ad Litem Decision = G Closed = 07/02/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2007
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 06/04/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2007
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 06/04/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2007
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 06/04/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARBONE, MARK R.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee J. Danforth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZGERALD, WILLIAM F.