Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/07/2018 at 05:27:00 (UTC).

V. Humphrey vs M. Phelan

Case Summary

On 10/09/2008 V Humphrey filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against M Phelan. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Yep, Steven L, Madden, James P and Kline, Stephen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5666

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Yep, Steven L

Madden, James P

Kline, Stephen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Virginia P Humphrey

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Humphrey, Virginia P

Defendants

Margaret Phelan

Palo Alto, CA 94303

Phelan, Margaret

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Phelan, Margaret; Party: Name: Humphrey, Virginia P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Phelan, Margaret; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Humphrey, Virginia P; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Humphrey, Virginia P; Judgment Amount: $7,585.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Phelan, Margaret; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $85.00; Other: $7,500.00; Total: $7585.00; Comment: printdate=Jan 27 2009; freetext=plaintiff does not owe plaintiff any money on plaintiff's claim.; origjudgdate=Jan 26 2009; judgstatusdate=Jan 27 2009; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2008
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Phelan, Margaret; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Humphrey, Virginia P; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Taken Under Submission; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 01/26/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2009
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = M Closed = 01/27/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2009
  • Defendant's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Defendant Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 01/15/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Kline, Stephen; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = P Result Judge = SK - Kline, Stephen Result Date = 11/17/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Certified Mail Returned to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2008
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 10/09/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2008
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000 - Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $5001-$7500 Decision = M Closed = 01/26/2009

    Read MoreRead Less